Accounts and annual returns SIGNS OF LIFE

Charity number: 1176097
Charity reporting is overdue by 1743 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1013 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1013 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1378 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1378 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1743 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1743 days