THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, HOLBROOK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church of England, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

21 Trustee(s)
160 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 October 2017: Standard registration
- ST MARK'S CHURCH, HOLBROOK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Timothy James Stilwell | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Haydon | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Yelland | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Waterson | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Connor Cruise Carey | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Bird | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Hanson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Daniel John Shorey | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GAYNOR UDESHI | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark William Leddin | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Anne Gardner | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PHILIP ALLEN | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|||||
BRIAN NORMAN CARTER | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cyril Smith | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rod Kitchin | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DARREN STEWART RUSSELL HNC IENG | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Crump | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Christine Anderson | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ANITA PARK | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Yvonne Humble | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STEPHEN PARRY | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.04k | £263.23k | £286.19k | £361.50k | £315.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £366.00k | £202.00k | £240.93k | £297.70k | £314.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mark's Church
St Mark's Lane
Horsham
West Sussex
RH12 5PU
- Phone:
- 01403261380
- Email:
- pcc@stmarksholbrook.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window