CHRIST VICTORY OUTREACH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Midweek Bible Studies Prayer meetings Youth meetings Sunday services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALFRED SARPONG AGYEMANG | Chair | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLADYS OPOKU | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
FRANK OHENE SARPONG | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
EUNICE ANTWI | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
COMFORT SARPONG ODURO | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE OBIRI | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
AGNESS POKUAH | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR CHRISTABEL AKORFUL | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE OWUSU | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.96k | £22.57k | £15.15k | £11.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.90k | £22.73k | £20.76k | £14.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 563 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 563 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 March 2022 | 492 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 March 2022 | 492 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Oct 2017 as amended on 08 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 The principal purposes of the Church are:- 3.1.1 The advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. 3.1.2 The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
184 Peveril Street
Nottingham
Nottinghamshire
NG7 4AH
- Phone:
- 07717537183
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window