VICTORIA PARK INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS', FRIENDS' AND TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for Victoria Park Infant School through events and activities such as Summer Fairs, Santa's grotto, cake sales, Curry & Quiz nights and raffles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Trafford
Governance
- 04 October 2017: Standard registration
- VICTORIA PARK INFANT SCHOOL PFTA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Frances Baker | Chair | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Wall | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.24k | £11.49k | £8.30k | £9.22k | £4.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £2.90k | £19.65k | £7.12k | £5.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 June 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 APR 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BY: - DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL - ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORIA PARK INFANT SCHOOL
HENSHAW STREET
STRETFORD
MANCHESTER
M32 8BU
- Phone:
- 01618654778
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window