BLOOMSBURY NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to preserve and improve the good health of people living with HIV, particularly (though not exclusively) those attending the Bloomsbury Clinic. We achieve this by providing information, advice, and raising awareness of issues pertaining to living with HIV and its associated co-morbidities, primarily through educational forums, workshops and courses, as well as community and social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fergal Scully | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Ahmed | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr IAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HAWKSWORTH | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.98k | £6.31k | £28.00k | £7.00k | £3.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.25k | £2.15k | £4.45k | £10.23k | £17.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV, PARTICULARLY THOSE ATTENDING THE BLOOMSBURY CLINIC, BUT NOT EXCLUDING OTHERS LIVING WITH OR AFFECTED BY HIV THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES (INCLUDING THE GENERAL PUBLIC), BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE, AND RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES PERTAINING TO LIVING WITH HIV AND ITS ASSOCIATED CO-MORBIDITIES, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: - EDUCATIONAL FORUMS THAT PROMOTE COMMUNITY EDUCATION VIA PRESENTATIONS FROM SPECIALIST SPEAKERS AND DISCUSSION OF THE LATEST DEVELOPMENTS IN CLINICAL, LEGAL AND PSYCHO-SOCIAL ISSUES PERTAINING TO LIVING WITH HIV; - COURSES AND WORKSHOPS THAT DISSEMINATE INFORMATION, CHALLENGE MISCONCEPTIONS, ALLEVIATE STIGMA AND PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE NEWLY DIAGNOSED; - COMMUNITY AND SOCIAL EVENTS THAT ALLEVIATE ISOLATION AND PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF SELF-MANAGEMENT SKILLS AS WELL AS PSYCHOLOGICAL AND PHYSICAL WELL-BEING. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS DOCUMENT: 'PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV' IS DEFINED AS ADULTS OF ANY AGE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, OR CULTURAL BACKGROUND WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH THE HUMAN IMMUNE DEFICIENCY VIRUS FOR ANY LENGTH OF TIME. 'STIGMA' IS DEFINED AS PREJUDICE, NEGATIVE ATTITUDES AND ABUSE DIRECTED AT PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV AND AIDS, BASED ON THEIR ACTUAL OR PERCEIVED HEALTH STATUS, INCLUDING NEGATIVE JUDGMENTS THAT RESULT IN FEELINGS OF SHAME, WORTHLESSNESS AND BLAME DIRECTED BY PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV TOWARD THEMSELVES (SELF-STIGMA).
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLOOMSBURY CLINIC
MORTIMER MARKET CENTRE
MORTIMER MARKET
LONDON
WC1E 6JB
- Phone:
- 02033175177
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window