Accounts and annual returns ST JOSEPH'S PLAYERS

Charity number: 1177928
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2023 05 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 05 April 2024 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time