Financial history ST JOSEPH'S PLAYERS

Charity number: 1177928
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/07/2024
Total gross income £34.05k £0 £2.72k £30.97k £37.40k
Total expenditure £20.31k £428 £1.12k £17.86k £28.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A £1.50k £1.50k