Accounts and annual returns A CLASS OF THEIR OWN

Charity number: 1178824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 October 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2023 16 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2022 31 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2021 19 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2020 19 July 2022 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2020 Not Required