A CLASS OF THEIR OWN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to advance the education of the pupils at Winsley Church of England Primary School by providing and assisting in the provision of improved educational and learning facilities (not required to be provided by the local education authority) at the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN SPARROWHAWK | Chair | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNIKA ATKINS | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNA OWEN | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/10/2020 | 03/10/2021 | 03/10/2022 | 03/10/2023 | 03/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £71 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.93k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 October 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2020 | 19 July 2022 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT WINSLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF IMPROVED EDUCATIONAL AND LEARNING FACILITIES (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winsley C of E Primary School
Tyning Road
Winsley
Bradford-on-Avon
BA15 2JN
- Phone:
- 07989556620
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window