RAF PATHFINDERS ARCHIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advances education about WWII RAF Pathfinder aircrew via such items as photographs, letters, flying logbooks, prisoner of war logbooks, personal belongings, medals, official RAF documents, and wartime publications. These artifacts are either directly related to the Pathfinders, or are used as an illustration of the wider context in which the Pathfinders and Bomber Command functioned.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jennie Gray | Chair | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carl Thomas | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Blackwood | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Donald Feast | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Arthur Clifford | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.74k | £740 | £7.05k | £1.57k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.89k | £18 | £6.82k | £1.92k | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jan 2018 as amended on 10 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE OF MATERIAL COMPRISING PHOTOGRAPHS, DOCUMENTS, ARTEFACTS AND MEMOIRS RELATING TO THE RAF PATHFINDERS OF WWII; TO CATEGORISE, INTERPRET AND PUBLISH COMMENTARY ON THE MATERIAL; AND TO ARRANGE DISPLAYS WITH, AND EXCHANGE, LOAN OR DONATE MATERIAL TO SUITABLE MUSEUMS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PUBLIC EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PATHFINDER OFFICE
The Pennys
Winforton
HEREFORD
HR3 6EA
- Phone:
- 07769717973
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window