MOOR PARK PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1175703
Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our object is to advance the education of pupils at Moor Park School by means of the following: To act as liaison with new parents, welcoming them into the school community To play an active role in nurturing relationships between Moor Park and the local area To support the development plan of the school To engage in activities which support and enhance the welfare and education of the pupils

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £37,357
Total expenditure: £36,276

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MPPA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Hathaway Chair 22 June 2018
None on record
Julia Perkins Trustee 22 June 2018
None on record
Sarah Thornhill Trustee 22 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £11.82k £2.70k £4.06k £9.93k £37.36k
Total expenditure £16.99k £2.91k £505 £8.94k £36.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 November 2024 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 November 2024 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Moor Park School
Moor Park
Richards Castle
LUDLOW
SY8 4DZ
Phone:
01584 876061
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available