BACZAC HIS LEGACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We currently provide Gift cards, food vouchers and small grants for Cancer patients in three Teenage Cancer Units in Nottingham, Leicester and Cambridge. We hopefully will expand this to other TCU`s when funds allow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN FORSKITT | Chair | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Hopley | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Harper | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY CHEYNE | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Levi Draper | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEE REED | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
BETHAN FORSKITT | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.20k | £52.74k | £60.91k | £49.08k | £53.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.88k | £12.95k | £14.25k | £28.07k | £22.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY MAKING GRANTS OR DONATIONS THAT WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF ANYONE SUFFERING FROM CANCER IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING GIFT CARDS AND VOUCHERS TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN ENGLAND AND WALES AGED 17 - 24 TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (2) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF ANYONE SUFFERING FROM CANCER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE IN ENGLAND AND WALES AGED 17- 24, AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THOSE CARING FOR THEM AND THEIR BEREAVED FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RESPITE HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Lakeside
Overstone Park
Overstone
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 0QS
- Phone:
- 01604451311
- Email:
- baczachislegacy@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window