THE PERIMETER LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of an art gallery and contemporary art exhibition space to advance education in the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
Governance
- 22 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDER VOURECAS PETALAS | Chair | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER DAVID LEWIS | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HOWARD STONE | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.56k | £40.43k | £94.69k | £121.34k | £371.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.99k | £42.56k | £75.83k | £95.74k | £259.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ART GALLERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Brownlow Mews
LONDON
WC1N 2LE
- Phone:
- 02037555371
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window