Financial history THE CHARLIE GARD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1176344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £113.33k £77.84k £96.27k £36.77k £17.31k
Total expenditure £295.95k £389.26k £261.83k £206.01k £106.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A