THE CHARLIE GARD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support families affected by mitochondrial disease offering services to aid a better quality of life, and fund research into viable treatments for this currently incurable disease. We aim to raise awareness for mitochondrial disease within the general public through a variety of events, and support patients by connecting them to the correct support networks within the mitochondrial community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Italy
- Scotland
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 18 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Evers | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Mendlesohn | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES DA SILVA | Trustee | 17 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.33k | £77.84k | £96.27k | £36.77k | £17.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.95k | £389.26k | £261.83k | £206.01k | £106.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2024 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2024 | 325 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2024 | 690 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2024 | 690 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (1) PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR RESEARCH INTO METHODS OF DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT FOR MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE AND RELATED SERVICES, AND TO HELP PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE FINDINGS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (2) RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT ALL AND ANY ISSUES RELATED TO MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE AMONG THE PUBLIC, MEDIA, LEGISLATORS AND AMONGST HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS; (3) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON MATTERS RELATED TO MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE, AND COMMENTING ON PROPOSED OR EXISTING LEGISLATION IMPACTING SERIOUS MEDICAL TREATMENT CASES; AND (4) PROVIDING FAMILIES LIVING WITH MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE WITH INFORMATION AND SUPPORT, INCLUDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT WHERE POSSIBLE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE "MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE" MEANS ANY OF THE GROUP OF CHRONIC, GENETIC DISORDERS CAUSED BY DYSFUNCTIONAL MITOCHONDRIA AND "SERIOUS MEDICAL TREATMENT CASE" HAS THE SAME MEANING AS GIVEN IN PRACTICE DIRECTION E, SUPPLEMENTING PART 9 OF THE COURT OF PROTECTION RULES, 2007. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 482
8 Church Street
INVERNESS
IV1 1EA
- Phone:
- 01642 917342
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window