Replacing Animal Research

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Replacing Animal Research is working towards it's mission of a world where no animal suffers for science. Replacing Animal Research promotes the elimination of the need to use laboratory animals through various activities including campaigning, publication of a scientific journal ATLA, grant schemes and through its educational work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2017: CIO registration
- THE FUND FOR THE REPLACEMENT OF ANIMALS IN MEDICAL EXPERIMENTS (F R A M E) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anja Petrie | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Nicola Contessi Negrini | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marija Zacharova | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Rea | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Byron Hyde | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Conway | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lindsay Marshall | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathrin Herrmann | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Purminder Singh Gill | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £674.14k | £480.11k | £618.47k | £432.66k | £266.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £524.86k | £310.26k | £608.80k | £625.16k | £399.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £613.37k | N/A | £436.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £27.61k | N/A | £127.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £33.15k | N/A | £16.63k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £38.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £555.35k | N/A | £394.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £459.15k | N/A | £554.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £65.71k | N/A | £54.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £203.68k | N/A | £225.83k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £80 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2017 as amended on 19 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF MANKIND BY WORKING TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PARTICULARLY WHEN SUCH ANIMALS ARE BEING USED AS SUBJECTS FOR MEDICAL BIOLOGICAL PHARMACEUTICAL AND OTHER ASSOCIATED RESEARCHES AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES MAY: A) PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RESEARCH INTO ACCEPTABLE NEW TECHNIQUES AND SUBSTITUTES FOR THE USE OF ANIMALS IN SUCH MEDICAL BIOLOGICAL PHARMACEUTICAL AND OTHER ASSOCIATED RESEARCHES AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCHES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT B) GIVE ALL POSSIBLE ENCOURAGEMENT ADVICE INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE TO THOSE ENGAGED IN THE FIELD OF MEDICAL BIOLOGICAL PHARMACEUTICAL AND ASSOCIATED RESEARCHES INVOLVING EXPERIMENTS ON ANIMALS SO AS TO AVOID UNINTENTIONAL CRUELTY AND UNNECESSARY SUFFERING C) FURTHER HUMAN INGENUITY TOWARDS EXPANDING EXISTING TECHNIQUES FOR REPLACING ANIMALS IN SUCH EXPERIMENTATION AND TOWARDS DISCOVERING MORE RELIABLE HUMANE AND ETHICAL METHODS OF EXPERIMENTATION D) PROVIDE AWARDS SCHOLARSHIPS AND PRIZES FOR THOSE DISCOVERING NEW AND IMPROVED TECHNIQUES AS ALTERNATIVES TO THE USE OF ANIMALS IN ANY MEDICAL BIOLOGICAL PHARMACEUTICAL AND ASSOCIATED RESEARCHES E) ARRANGE MEETINGS CONFERENCE SEMINARS AND DISCUSSIONS F) EDUCATE AND ADVISE PUBLIC OPINION G) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING APPROPRIATE EQUIPMENT AND FINANCIAL AID TO EXISTING AND/OR NEW LABORATORIES H) COLLECT OBTAIN AND ANALYSE INFORMATION IN RELATION TO THE ADVANTAGES OF REPLACING ANIMALS IN EXPERIMENTATION BY SUITABLE SUBSTITUTES I) STIMULATE THE REVISION OF MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL EDUCATIONAL CURRICULA ESPECIALLY IN THE FIELDS OF PHYSIOLOGY AND COGNATE SCIENCES SO THAT FULL REGARD IS PAID TO ACCEPTABLE AND EFFICIENT SUBSTITUTES FOR ANIMALS IN EXPERIMENTATION AND SO THAT THE USE OF SENTIENT LIVING ANIMALS IN RESEARCH AND ROUTINE TESTING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY IS REDUCED AS FAR AS POSSIBLE J) ORGANISE AND ESTABLISH CHARITABLE BRANCHES OF THE CHARITY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHEREVER NEED IS FOUND TO EXIST K) MAKE CONTRIBUTIONS TO OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS HAVING OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THE CHARITY: OR OTHERWISE TO ASSIST SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS L) DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS SHALL BE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLAYTON & BREWILL
CAWLEY HOUSE
149-155 CANAL STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 7HR
- Phone:
- 01159584740
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window