READING KOREAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) preaching, teaching and proclaiming the Gospel of Jesus Christ and engaging in evangelism and missionary activities; (b) providing and supporting the instruction of Church members and the public in the Christian faith (c) providing pastoral care and support to those attending the Church and giving spiritual and practical help to such persons and to members of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Reading
- Wokingham
Governance
- 01 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shinkoo Cho | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hill | Trustee | 29 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN FINCH | Trustee | 29 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ANTHONY HILL | Trustee | 29 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.03k | £29.22k | £25.60k | £28.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.42k | £30.24k | £25.17k | £27.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2023 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE KOREAN COMMUNITY AND ASSOCIATED PERSONS IN READING AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH OF THE KOREAN COMMUNITY AND ASSOCIATED PERSONS IN READING AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK OR IN NEED AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN READING AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN READING AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O TYNDALE BAPTIST CHURCH
2-4 CRESSINGHAM ROAD
READING
RG2 7JE
- Phone:
- 07930923366
- Email:
- pastortaero@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window