Financial history THE YORKSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity Number: 1175099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £131.57k £118.68k £231.04k £194.23k £216.16k
Total expenditure £110.58k £137.05k £125.93k £151.95k £163.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A