THE YORKSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making of Grants for the maintenance and repair of Christian churches in Yorkshire (boundaries as before 1974)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 October 2017: CIO registration
- 13 December 2018: Funds received from 700639 THE YORKSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
- YHCT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS JAMES PONSONBY RAMSDEN | Chair | 11 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
Joel Brice Oliver Brookfield | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Katherine Fleur Giles | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Clive Roland Lloyd | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Moira Fulton | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Christopher Michael Garside Wildblood | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
RICHARD CHARLES BAILEY | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
SYLVIA JOHNSON | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||
RORY WARDROPER | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.26k | £131.57k | £118.68k | £231.04k | £194.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.24k | £110.58k | £137.05k | £125.93k | £151.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF CHURCHES IN YORKSHIRE AND OF MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS, BELLS, CLOCK AND CHIMES IN SUCH CHURCHES AND OF THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO ANY SUCH CHURCHES IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY MEANS OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, "CHURCHES" SHALL INCLUDE ANY CHURCH OR CHAPEL USED FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR THE TIME BEING WHETHER BELONGING TO OR USED BY ANY CHRISTIAN DENOMINATION AND "YORKSHIRE" SHALL INCLUDE THE NORTH RIDING, WEST RIDING, EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE TOGETHER WITH THE CITY AND COUNTY OF YORK AND THE CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON-UPON-HULL FORMERLY EXISTING BEFORE THE COMING INTO FORCE OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT ACT 1972 ON 1 APRIL 1974.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 DALTON TERRACE
YORK
YO24 4DA
- Phone:
- 01904643943
- Email:
- generalenquiries@yhct.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window