ORPHANS CARE FEDERATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Orphans Care Federation, A humanitarian non-governmental organization to support the humanitarian action work to provide better care for orphans and their families, OCF is a tool to connect organizations. OCF is registered in England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Iraq
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Turkey
Governance
- 15 November 2018: Standard registration
- 02 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.68k | £37.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.76k | £31.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 AUG 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS THAT ARE WORKING FOR THE BENEFIT OF ORPHANS BY: I) PROVIDING TRAINING, SERVICES AND SUPPORT; II) PROMOTING CO-OPERATION, CO-ORDINATION AND INFORMATION EXCHANGE; III) ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING INNOVATION; IV) PROVIDING REPRESENTATION AND ADVOCACY; V) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. B) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window