WESTFIELD LEARNING COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides out-of-school activities for the education and training of Westfield School Pupils to advance and enhance development and education of people of all ages without discrimination. Provide or assist in providing facilities for recreational or other leisure time, before and after school, weekends and holidays. Advancing the health & welfare of families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 06 February 1981: Standard registration
- 21 June 2023: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
- THE WESTFIELD SCHOOL TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £582 | £448 | £211.27k | £132 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.36k | £4.14k | £413 | £50.90k | £20.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 July 2021 | 30 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 January 2021 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13/01/1981 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH OR RELATING TO WESTFIELD SCHOOL OR ITS PRESENT OR PAST PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window