THE BEATRIX POTTER SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society shall seek to educate the public in and promote research into the life and works of Beatrix Potter by charitable ways and for the public benefit, and the Society shall publish the results of research. We welcome members worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Belarus
- Canada
- Croatia
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Japan
- Jersey
- Netherlands
- Norway
- South Africa
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 17 October 2017: CIO registration
- 28 July 2019: Funds received from 281198 THE BEATRIX POTTER SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Hunter MacFarlane | Chair | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Drag | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Brittney Wichard | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma White | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Helen Sirett | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Karen McIlwraith | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Lindsay Moen | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Adams | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.20k | £34.91k | £50.53k | £47.50k | £57.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.12k | £18.18k | £18.37k | £28.42k | £51.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY SHALL SEEK TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE LIFE AND WORKS OF BEATRIX POTTER BY CHARITABLE WAYS AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND THE SOCIETY SHALL PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jackson and Graham
Chartered Accountants
Lake Road
Bowness on Windermere
Cumbria
LA23 2JJ
- Phone:
- +447787578746
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window