CAMDEN FENCING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CFCs objective is the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities, equipment and coaching for the sport of fencing in the London Borough of Camden. Activities include physical training and education available to all in the community, Mental wellbeing, Coaching, Mentoring, Support at competitions, Equipment loan, Bursaries, social events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Camden
Governance
- 17 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA AIYENURO | Chair | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Pearce | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David McDougall | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LORETTA LEBERKNIGHT | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.11k | £79.66k | £40.46k | £69.69k | £75.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.98k | £71.72k | £44.83k | £78.86k | £81.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 18 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
CFC'S OBJECT IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND COACHING FOR THE SPORT OF FENCING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 BARN FIELD
UPPER PARK ROAD
LONDON
NW3 2UU
- Phone:
- 07786064883
- Email:
- camdenfencingclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window