WILLESBOROUGH BAPTIST PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education (including spiritual development) of children below compulsory school age and the provision of facilities for recreation in the interest of social welfare and to improve quality of life and to provide for all children without discrimination a safe and satisfying pre-school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £82,751 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 17 October 2017: CIO registration
- 22 June 2023: Funds received from 1143686 WILLESBOROUGH BAPTIST CHURCH PRE -SCHOOL
- WILLESBOROUGH BAPTIST CHURCH PRE -SCHOOL (Previous name)
- WILLESBOROUGH BAPTIST PRE -SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Stephen Hirst | Chair | 29 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Katie Moyles | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grainne Kelly Boylan | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Mary Lillicrap | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Perks | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH BODDY | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.31k | £82.86k | £123.61k | £130.22k | £121.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.07k | £94.03k | £92.89k | £130.00k | £149.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £69.56k | N/A | £104.65k | £82.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | £3.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT) OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE, AND 2.2 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR SUCH CHILDREN IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY: PROVIDING FOR ALL CHILDREN WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION A SAFE AND SATISFYING PRE-SCHOOL WITH A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT WHERE CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND VALUES ARE PROMOTED AND UPHELD. THIS WILL BE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH WHICH SEEKS TO PROVIDE SERVICES TO THE COMMUNITY AND TO PROVIDE CHRISTIANITY WITHIN IT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willesborough Baptist Church
Hythe Road
Willesborough
ASHFORD
TN24 0QR
- Phone:
- 01233632739
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window