Financial history WILLINGTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 511033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.33k £14.79k £23.94k £15.14k £15.58k
Total expenditure £8.26k £6.77k £8.20k £14.63k £15.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.67k N/A N/A