KNARESBOROUGH LIONS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a group of charitable men and women working for and with the community, hosting activities (including a bed race and a beer festival) to raise money to support good causes. At least 80% of what we raise is distributed to local causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £1,100 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Lloyd | Chair | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Henry Simpson | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hall | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Pyle | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Godsell | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Quentin Smithells | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA GODSELL | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHRISTOPHER BROCK | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LISA SWIERS | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ANDREW HENRY PERRY | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.46k | £59.67k | £6.62k | £95.94k | £95.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.05k | £64.63k | £15.16k | £74.71k | £95.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 July 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 July 2024 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: 1.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY: 1.1.1.1 PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; 1.1.1.2 ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; 1.1.1.3 PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; 1.1.1.4 ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; 1.1.1.5 SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 1.1.2 PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; 1.1.3 PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; 1.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; 1.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; 1.1.6 PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR 1.1.7 PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beechwood
Ripley Road
KNARESBOROUGH
North Yorkshire
HG5 9BY
- Phone:
- 07595 212763
- Email:
- kevinlloydkna@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window