Financial history CHRIST CHURCH PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP CIO

Charity number: 1175198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £66.40k £56.96k £78.18k £90.15k £97.85k
Total expenditure £66.99k £59.46k £71.03k £78.39k £90.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £52.06k £57.33k £55.20k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A