ZERO HUNGER WITH LANGAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We serve daily meals around the world to people suffering from the effects of hunger.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 November 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Botswana
- Kenya
Governance
- 15 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jagjit Singh | Chair | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/11/2019 | 13/11/2020 | 13/11/2021 | 13/11/2022 | 13/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 November 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 November 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 November 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 November 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 November 2020 | 25 September 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 November 2020 | 25 September 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 November 2019 | 14 September 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 November 2019 | 14 September 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE AROUND THE WORLD WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM HUNGER AND MALNUTRITION BY SUPPLYING THEM WITH FOOD, WATER AND ACCESS TO EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NISHKAM CENTRE
6 SOHO ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B21 9BH
- Phone:
- 07762354171
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window