ROWLANDS GILL VOLUNTEER LIBRARY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rowlands Gill Volunteer Library Association provides library facility and service in Rowlands Gill Library, Norman Road, Rowlands Gill NE39 1JT. In addition we provide other education community resources and activities for residents of Rowlands Gill and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
Governance
- 21 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY JOHN DEVEAUX | Chair | 10 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Valerie Rankin | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Denise Yvonne Joan Taylor | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Harvey | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Whisler | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
LYNN CAROL DEVEAUX | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.46k | £15.26k | £28.35k | £9.12k | £10.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.59k | £10.20k | £8.52k | £10.32k | £12.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.20k | £10.00k | £23.35k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY FACILITY AND SERVICE AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL COMMUNITY RESOURCES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF ROWLANDS GILL AND SURROUNDING AREAS. (2) TO FURTHER BENEFIT THE SAID INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR ANY OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (3) TO PROMOTE OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY, FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rowlands Gill Library
Norman Road
ROWLANDS GILL
Tyne And Wear
NE39 1JT
- Phone:
- 01027 542372
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window