CROMWELL BOTTOM WILDLIFE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To conserve and protect the wildlife and natural environment of Cromwell Bottom Local Nature Reserve and North Loop
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Calderdale
Governance
- 12 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON DAY | Chair | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN STAPLES | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN OWEN- MORLEY | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
TONY SPILSBURY MR | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LANDELLS | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANN JACKSON | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY COTTRELL | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN WOLFENDEN | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HAIGH | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LANGLEY | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HENSHAW | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE HOYLE | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.19k | £9.37k | £27.92k | £40.46k | £39.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.42k | £13.57k | £7.46k | £22.64k | £31.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 233 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION OF THE WILDLIFE AND WILDLIFE HABITATS AND PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE SITES KNOWN AS CROMWELL BOTTOM LOCAL NATURE RESERVE AND NORTH LOOP. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
184 Healey Wood Road
BRIGHOUSE
West Yorkshire
HD6 3RW
- Phone:
- 07516512743
- Email:
- cbwgwildlife@gmail.com
- Website:
-
cromwellbottomlnr.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window