Financial history INVOLVE NEPAL

Charity number: 1175436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/02/2020 20/02/2021 20/02/2022 20/02/2023 20/02/2024
Total gross income £3.71k £7.26k £5.13k £1.04k £2.91k
Total expenditure £23.13k £6.68k £7.33k £1.68k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A