CAM, DURSLEY & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing educational and cultural activities for the elderly ( over the age of 55) who are no longer in full time employment. The activities consist of lectures, seminars, classes and visits to the theatre, museums and other similar culture attractions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 08 December 2017: Standard registration
- DURSLEY U3A (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MALCOLM TAYLOR | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
john walton | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Haestier | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Sirett | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Padfield | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan James Keith | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Philip HOBSON | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|||||
MYRTLE MORETON-COX | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luke Marcus Wilson | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.31k | £3.45k | £22.23k | £36.00k | £6.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.30k | £4.57k | £20.27k | £35.05k | £7.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF THE U3A IS: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTALRESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN CAMS, DURSLEY AND DISTRICT [AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY]
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Lister Road
DURSLEY
Gloucestershire
GL11 4FH
- Phone:
- 07973757554
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window