THE SUSSEX ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recently incorporated previous Reg'd Charity No. 247430 Working with those in Sussex who have spina bifida and/or hydrocephalus to create and develop their best opportunities. Activities include and Adviser service, one stop clinic, family support work, buddy scheme, residential breaks, education advice, youth clubs, newlsetter, website, training and work experience opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,755 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 October 2017: Standard registration
- SASBAH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Filtness | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY MCDERMOTT-ROE | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Kirby | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Lewis | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Matt West | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.75k | £267.34k | £267.34k | £243.27k | £230.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £242.38k | £201.00k | £201.00k | £226.82k | £252.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £37.68k | £9.46k | £25.93k | £10.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SPINA BIFIDA AND/OR HYDROCEPHALUS OR ALLIED RELATED DISORDERS WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WERE FORMALLY RESIDENT IN THE COUNTIES OF EAST AND WEST SUSSEX AND ADJACENT AREAS BY PROVIDING FOR THEIR CARE, WELFARE, TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The JPK Sussex Project
39-41 Church Street
Old Town
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN21 1HP
- Phone:
- 01825873045
- Email:
- office@sasbah.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window