HAYWARDS HEATH LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1177456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Application of funds to individuals and organisations in accordance with the club's Grant Making Policy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £27,036
Total expenditure: £33,238

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 March 2018: CIO registration
  • 29 March 2019: Funds received from 297200 HAYWARDS HEATH LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GWENDOLINE HELEN KENNEDY Chair 01 July 2019
None on record
Alfred Bryan Barnes Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
DAVID JOHN CAMPBELL COLVILLE Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
RICHARD JOHNSON Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Colin Brunt Trustee 18 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.73k £9.27k £16.89k £19.55k £27.04k
Total expenditure £13.40k £6.29k £6.93k £18.37k £33.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 23 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 1
Corrin House
32 Oathall Road
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 3EQ
Phone:
01444412565