CREDITON CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crediton Congregational Church runs regular worship services, prayer meetings, community events, youth and children's groups. All of our events are open to all. The church has 132 members and 40 adherents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
114 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 06 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor JAMES GREGORY | Chair | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Jacob Lloyd | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Barton | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Associate Pastor David Laurence Poulson | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Frances Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Helen Preece | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.11k | £140.36k | £133.10k | £121.87k | £140.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.82k | £123.38k | £104.91k | £123.01k | £129.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 January 2022 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13 JUN 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND USAGES FOR THE TIME BEING OF CONGREGATIONALISM AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY SPECIFIC REQUIREMENTS IN THE FOUNDATION TRUSTS. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION RELIEVE NEED AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CREDITON CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH
HIGH STREET
CREDITON
EX17 3LF
- Phone:
- 01363772577
- Email:
- churchofficeccc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
creditoncongregational.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window