IDA DAVIS FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Foundation are to alleviate poverty, to advance education, to relieve sickness and to promote health and to preserve and protect the natural environment at home and abroad. As a grant making charity, the Constitution also provides for general charitable purposes for Public Benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Botswana
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- India
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 20 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH DAVIS | Chair | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CAMMIDGE | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN CAMMIDGE | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £527 | £2.58k | £313 | £6.58k | £30.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.04k | £35.14k | £165.65k | £336.98k | £245.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- (1) TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; (3) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE HEALTH; (4) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND (5) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
178 EASTERN ESPLANADE
THORPE BAY
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS1 3AA
- Phone:
- 01702587917
- Email:
- IDavisFoundation@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window