Financial history HALE VILLAGE HALL NEW FOREST

Charity number: 1175048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.13k £24.56k £31.65k £25.34k £29.72k
Total expenditure £63.78k £11.56k £25.01k £17.95k £30.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £12.11k £13.24k
Income from government grants £21.50k £10.00k £17.30k £2.67k £322