Financial history SURFERS NOT STREET CHILDREN UK

Charity number: 1176572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £181.46k £159.69k £207.19k £279.14k £363.30k
Total expenditure £173.69k £158.81k £198.57k £273.31k £281.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A