SURFERS NOT STREET CHILDREN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with street children (or former street children) in order to improve their quality of life. We will engage in campaigns throughout the UK, South Africa and Mozambique to change the rights of street children and the way in which society perceives street children. This will be achieved through advocacy, marketing and consultation work with other NGOs/ governmental organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Mozambique
- South Africa
Governance
- 08 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW BROOKES | Chair | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Walker | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joel David Meadows | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY RADCLIFFE | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.46k | £159.69k | £207.19k | £279.14k | £363.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.69k | £158.81k | £198.57k | £273.31k | £281.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF PERSONS, PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) STREET CHILDREN IN SOUTH AFRICA AND MOZAMBIQUE, WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED OR HARDSHIP AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESSED CAUSED BY SUCH CONDITIONS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLS COURT COTTAGE
NORTH DOWN ROAD
BRAUNTON
DEVON
EX33 2EE
- Phone:
- +27783947130
- Email:
- info@surfnotstreets.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window