Trustees SAVE HEMSBY COASTLINE

Charity number: 1177832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN BRENNAN Chair 04 January 2016
None on record
Molly Cooper Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Kevin Paul Jordan Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Christine Barnes Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Simon Measures Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Jacqueline Brennan Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Lorna Yvonne Bevan-Thompson Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Lesley Lilian Terriss Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
ADRIANNE LAKE Trustee 13 September 2017
None on record
TERRY BARNES Trustee 04 January 2016
None on record
LYNDON BEVAN Trustee 17 December 2014
None on record