POOLE COMMUNITY EXCHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help people who are socially excluded. Provide activities in the interests of social welfare. Provide chaplaincy services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £25,227 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Poole
Governance
- 02 May 2018: CIO registration
- PCE (Working name)
- THE COMMUNITY EXCHANGE (Working name)
- THE EXCHANGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M PHILLIPS | Chair | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Helen Fraser Beardsley | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Hancock | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarah Percy BAHONS MBA | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £84.88k | £41.95k | £46.63k | £68.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.15k | £72.83k | £25.19k | £59.04k | £62.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.50k | £12.00k | £13.70k | £25.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 March 2022 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF AND VISITORS TO, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE TOWN OF POOLE – 1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION, BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE; WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER RESIDENTS, VISITORS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS; 3. TO PROMOTE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF CHAPLAINCY SERVICES TO OFFER ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: • UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING DRUGS AND ALCOHOL; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER REASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; HOMELESSNESS OR POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Parkstone United Reformed Church
Commercial Road
Parkstone
POOLE
Dorset
BH14 0JW
- Phone:
- 07980002676
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window