Financial history GROWING COMPASSIONATE COMMUNITIES

Charity Number: 1176047
Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/10/2020 03/10/2021 03/10/2022 03/10/2023 03/10/2024
Total gross income £13.57k £9.84k £34.26k £3.61k £4.62k
Total expenditure £5.15k £5.09k £13.59k £6.58k £11.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £30.00k N/A N/A