GROWING COMPASSIONATE COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY BUILDING AND DISSEMINATING COMMUNITY BASED METHODOLOGIES TO PREVENT PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER WILLIAM JONES RMN FRSA | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Teresa Hay | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Weber-Wright | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/10/2020 | 03/10/2021 | 03/10/2022 | 03/10/2023 | 03/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.57k | £9.84k | £34.26k | £3.61k | £4.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £5.09k | £13.59k | £6.58k | £11.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 October 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 03 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 October 2022 | 19 August 2024 | 382 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2022 | 19 August 2024 | 382 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 October 2021 | 02 January 2023 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2021 | 02 January 2023 | 152 days late | |
Annual return | 03 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY BUILDING AND DISSEMINATING COMMUNITY BASED METHODOLOGIES TO PREVENT PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER REASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY)."
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coles Miller Solicitors Llp
Harbour House
Marshes End
Upton Road
Poole
- Phone:
- 01202338888
- Email:
- aweber@coles-miller.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window