MULTICULTURAL CUMBRIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Multicultural Cumbria has four Black, Asian and Minority Ethnic programme areas: Culture, Education, Events, Health and Wellbeing, for the preservation of race, heritage, identity of ethnic diversities in the Cumbria. Delivery through workshops, demos, talks, performances and community social events using The Arts, Food, Sport, Arts & Crafts to reduce isolation and prejudice towards BAME people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £5,300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 04 December 2017: CIO registration
- MULTICULTURAL CUMBRIA (Working name)
- MULTICULTURAL CARLISLE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Matolo Musau Kioko | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Exley | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tiffany Christel Lew | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zreen Mansha | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aldwin Samuel | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.80k | £109.58k | £79.23k | £159.34k | £123.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.50k | £44.48k | £94.56k | £158.78k | £128.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | £45.54k | £5.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Dec 2017 as amended on 29 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CARLISLE BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
University Of Cumbria
Room 003
Homeacres
Brampton Road
Carlisle
Cumbria
- Phone:
- 03003020924
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window