Trustees THE BIRTH PARTNER PROJECT

Charity number: 1179100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Catherine Woolley Chair 01 July 2024
None on record
Madeleine Joan McGivern Trustee 12 July 2024
None on record
Dr Laura Shobiye Trustee 12 April 2024
None on record
Christianah Ugbaja Trustee 28 July 2022
None on record
Gillian Boden Trustee 28 July 2022
None on record
Jill Hunter Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
SMITHA COUGHLAN Trustee 05 June 2018
None on record