THE MAGPIE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide practical support and advice to mothers and children under five in temporary or insecure accommodation in Newham. We believe all children have a right to a secure, safe place to play, healthy food, engaged parents, and access support no matter what their family circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £5,820 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 13 December 2017: CIO registration
- 19 July 2023: Funds received from 1158787 INGEENIUM
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Ward | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Amy Ross | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sveta Alladi | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Paula Reily | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Therese Radhika Bynon | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.84k | £288.79k | £368.39k | £246.14k | £429.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.76k | £168.38k | £244.94k | £310.79k | £446.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.60k | £14.45k | £8.15k | N/A | £5.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 28 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR FAMILIES WITH YOUNG CHILDREN LIVING IN TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION OR AT THREAT OF HOMELESSNESS IN NEWHAM AND ADJACENT BOROUGHS - IN PARTICULAR PROVIDING A SPACE TO PLAY AND LEARN, AND FOR PARENTS AND CARERS TO GAIN PROFESSIONAL ADVICE AND FORM A SOCIAL NETWORKS IN ORDER TO ALLEVIATE IMMEDIATE DIFFICULTIES, SEEK SOLUTIONS TO ADDRESS THEIR NEEDS AND RE-INTEGRATE INTO EXISTING UNIVERSAL SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grassroots Centre
Memorial Avenue
LONDON
E15 3DB
- Phone:
- 07561180825
- Email:
- themagpieprojecte7@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window