MESH UK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support those injured by surgical mesh by providing online and telephone support, raising awareness with information sharing on social media platforms and provide respite breaks for those injured by surgical mesh and their family members by providing access to holiday accommodation in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CANDIA ANNA MCCULLOUGH | Chair | 04 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Juliet Leong | Trustee | 22 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cox | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA HOPKINSON | Trustee | 04 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN MCCULLOUGH | Trustee | 04 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.23k | £1.87k | £760 | £1.02k | £143 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75k | £1.75k | £927 | £1.34k | £594 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF SURGICAL MESH IMPLANTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: • THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND INFORMATION ON WAYS TO LIVE WITH THE COMPLEX HEALTH ISSUES CAUSED BY SOME MESH IMPLANTS. • THE PROVISION OF SHORT RESPITE BREAKS BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO A HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION IN THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Little Gaddesden
BERKHAMSTED
Hertfordshire
HP4 1PH
- Phone:
- 07963600880
- Email:
- info@meshuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window