THE BIG REVEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Big Reveal is a Charity which celebrates music, art and people, placing culture at the core of education, community and life. Produces, commissions, tours and delivers brilliant, innovative outreach - takes artists to hard-to-reach areas and communities . Is an on-the-ground, highly effective audience development framework, engaging participants in creative experiences and performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 20 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr HANNAH COOK | Chair | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Camille Davies | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Humphries | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Oluwafemi Ogunbona | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARAH FRANCES SMITH | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES ELIZABETH TREWARTHA | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|||||
JULIA ROBINSON | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET BURRIDGE | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.62k | £22.16k | £4.50k | £60.88k | £16.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.21k | £8.20k | £25.23k | £14.83k | £57.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £37.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DANCE AND DRAMA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PRESENTATION OF HIGH QUALITY, COMPELLINGLY DELIVERED PERFORMANCE AND OUTREACH ARTS ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN, ADULTS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY WHICH ENGAGE PARTICIPANTS IN CREATIVE EXPERIENCES AND PERFORMANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sparrow Hatch
Barnsole Road
Staple
CANTERBURY
CT3 1LD
- Phone:
- 01304611888
- Email:
- drburridge@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window