HARBORNE AND SMETHWICK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The provision of safe and secure sheltered accommodation for people aged 60 years and over in Smethwick and Harborne who wish to continue to live independently; 2. The provision of financial support to persons in conditions of hardship or need in Smethwick and Harborne.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,872,928
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.09m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £783.85k | |
Other | £529 |
Total expenditure:
£2,160,287
Raising funds | £271.44k | |
Charitable activities | £1.89m | |
Other | £0 |
£551,186 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £271.44k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.89m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £271.44k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.89m | |
Retained for future use | £263.83k |
People

11 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
Governance
- 13 March 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Jeffrey | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr. Ragih Muflihi | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Adrian Brooke Taylor | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Leadbeter | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS GEORGE WAYT | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR SILVESTER | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY HEWITT | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SILBER | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
BUDDHI CHETIYAWARDANA | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ROHAN THOMPSON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44m | £1.45m | £1.57m | £1.66m | £1.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30m | £1.28m | £1.51m | £1.83m | £2.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £850.96k | £870.61k | £901.03k | £956.53k | £1.09m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £587.03k | £580.02k | £667.32k | £707.08k | £783.85k | |
|
Income - Other | £319 | £2.45k | £2 | £361 | £529 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.04m | £1.08m | £1.27m | £1.46m | £1.89m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £260.50k | £198.67k | £237.19k | £375.36k | £271.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £55.04k | £47.62k | £57.46k | £68.36k | £78.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £83.22k | £96.00k | £163.72k | £230.26k | £286.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £260.50k | £198.67k | £237.19k | £375.36k | £271.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.56m | £4.45m | £4.34m | £4.31m | £15.39m | |
|
Long-term investments | £15.44m | £15.95m | £15.48m | £16.31m | £5.93m | |
|
Other assets | £1.72m | £2.10m | £2.31m | £2.31m | £1.92m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £458.61k | £317.42k | £335.42k | £434.28k | £478.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING OR MANAGING HOUSING OR ACCOMODATION APPROPRIATE TO THE NEEDS OF PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ARE OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO PERSONS OTHERWISE ELIGIBLE THEREFOR WHO ARE RESIDENT IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT BUT IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OUGHT NEVERTHELESS FOR SUFFICIENT REASON TO BE TREATED AS IF RESIDENT THEREIN, OR WHO ARE LOCATED FOR THE TIME BEING WITHIN THAT AREA. 2. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS AND FORMER RESIDENTS OF THE PROPERTIES PROVIDED OR MANAGED BY THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF HARBORNE, WHICH SHALL INCLUDE THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST BONIFACE, QUINTON ROAD WEST, BIRMINGHAM, ST FAITH AND ST LAURENCE, HARBORNE, ST JOHN, HARBORNE, ST PETER, HARBORNE, ST ALBANS, SMETHWICK, ST CHAD, SMETHWICK, ST MARY, SMETHWICK, ST MATTHEW, SMETHWICK, ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, SMETHWICK, ST STEPHEN’S, SMETHWICK AND ST PAUL, WEST SMETHWICK AND SUCH OTHER ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARBORNE PARISH LANDS CHARITY
109 COURT OAK ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B17 9AA
- Phone:
- 01214261600
- Email:
- info@hplc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window