FAB (FAMILIES' ACTIVITY BREAKS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FAB camps provide a full programme of adventurous activities for bereaved military families, including a variety of children's activities. All activities are conducted by fully insured, qualified and professional instructors using national standards of protection and safety equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN LAMBERTON | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sabiston | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BIRDSALL | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.33k | £1.00k | £55.02k | £8.75k | £82.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.00k | £17.60k | £120.83k | £97.41k | £76.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2018 as amended on 24 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 19 WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE LOSS OF A SERVING PARENT OR FAMILY MEMBER WHILST SERVING IN THE BRITISH ARMED FORCES BY THE PROVISION OF FUN AND CHALLENGING ACTIVITY BREAKS FOR BEREAVED MILITARY FAMILIES IN ORDER TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM THE EFFECTS OF BEREAVEMENT TO SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Chester Road
Whittington Barracks
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS14 9TF
- Phone:
- 07889186221
- Email:
- ceo@fabcamps.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window